Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/12/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/12/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/12/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/13/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/25/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/25/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/25/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/25/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/27/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/27/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/27/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/27/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/28/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/03/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 05/05/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/10/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/10/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/17/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/17/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/17/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/23/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/23/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/23/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/23/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48] 05/23/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/09/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/09/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/09/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/09/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 06/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/09/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/17/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/24/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/24/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 07/14/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/20/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 10/17/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/27/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 10/27/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/27/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 11/04/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/04/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 11/04/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/04/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/04/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/09/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 11/09/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/06/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 12/06/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/06/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/06/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/06/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/06/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/13/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/13/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 12/13/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/13/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/13/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/13/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/13/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/13/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 12/13/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/16/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 12/16/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/16/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/16/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 12/16/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/07/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/07/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/07/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/07/2006
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 02/07/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 02/07/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/14/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/14/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/28/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/28/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/02/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/02/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/02/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/07/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/09/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/14/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/14/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/16/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/16/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/16/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/28/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/29/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/30/2006
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/04/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/04/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/05/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/25/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/02/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/04/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/11/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/22/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/24/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/25/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/28/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/12/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/13/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/17/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/17/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/19/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 07/19/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/19/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/19/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/20/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/20/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/27/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/28/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/12/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/12/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/21/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/28/2006