Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/13/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/13/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/20/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/20/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/20/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/26/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/26/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/26/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/27/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/27/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/28/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/28/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/03/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/03/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/03/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/03/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/03/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/03/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/03/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/04/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/04/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/12/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/12/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/12/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/12/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/26/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/09/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/14/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/20/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/21/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/21/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/27/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/27/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/29/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/29/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/29/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/12/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/12/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/25/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/27/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/13/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/17/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/17/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/26/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/26/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/02/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/09/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/07/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/07/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/07/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/16/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/24/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/19/2006