Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/13/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/13/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/18/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/11/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/11/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/23/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/28/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/19/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/03/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/03/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/17/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/19/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/21/2006