Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/14/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/14/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/14/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/14/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/19/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/19/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/19/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/19/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/21/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 04/26/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/04/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/04/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/04/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/04/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/04/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/19/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/19/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/19/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/19/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/19/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/21/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/21/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/27/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/27/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/26/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/26/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/02/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 11/02/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 11/02/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/15/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/18/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/16/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/08/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/09/2006