Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/25/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/01/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/15/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/15/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/27/2005