Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/12/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/16/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/13/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/16/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/21/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/11/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/13/2005