Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/10/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/12/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/12/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/18/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/18/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/25/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/25/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/25/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/25/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/25/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/25/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/25/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/09/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/09/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/14/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/21/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/23/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/24/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 07/11/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/14/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/14/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/20/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/25/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/25/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/07/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/07/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/07/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/07/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/07/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 09/07/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/07/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/07/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/07/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/13/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/13/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/21/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/21/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/28/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/28/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/29/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/27/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/03/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/06/2005