Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/20/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/20/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/04/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/16/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/22/2005