Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/13/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 04/13/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/14/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/19/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/21/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/26/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/23/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/28/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/08/2005