Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/25/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/14/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/14/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/14/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/14/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/14/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/14/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/14/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/14/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/14/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/14/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/14/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/14/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/14/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/14/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/14/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/14/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/14/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/21/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/21/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/21/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/21/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/21/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/21/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/21/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/21/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/30/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/30/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/19/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/19/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/27/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/27/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/27/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/27/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/07/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/07/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/20/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/20/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/20/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/27/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/27/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/28/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/19/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 11/03/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/03/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/03/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/13/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/27/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/29/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/29/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/29/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/29/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/29/2006