Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/13/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/13/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/13/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/13/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/13/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/04/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/04/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/04/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/04/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/04/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/04/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/04/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/04/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/04/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/04/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/04/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/04/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/04/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/04/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/04/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/04/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/04/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/04/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/04/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/14/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/14/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/14/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/28/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/28/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/17/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 10/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/28/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/07/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/07/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/14/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/06/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/10/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/10/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/26/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/29/2006