Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/19/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/25/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/26/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/06/2005

Show cosponsors who withdrew