Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/19/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/19/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/19/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/20/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/20/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/26/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/27/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/27/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/27/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/27/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/28/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/28/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/03/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/03/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/12/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/17/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/16/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/20/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/07/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/01/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/09/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/09/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/16/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/16/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/06/2006