There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

Earmarks Process bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Obligation of Funds Transparency Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit Federal agencies from obligating funds for appropriations earmarks included only in congressional reports, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/14/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/14/2005Referred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/14/2005Referred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/14/2005Referred to the Committee on Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/14/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (76)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/27/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/12/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/18/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/18/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/26/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/15/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/15/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/31/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/31/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/31/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/31/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 01/31/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/31/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 01/31/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/01/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/01/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 02/08/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/08/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/08/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/08/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/08/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 02/08/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/08/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/08/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/15/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/15/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/15/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/01/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/01/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/01/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/01/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/29/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/08/2006
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/14/2005 09/07/2005 --

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform04/14/2005 Referred to
House Rules04/14/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1642. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/14/2005)

Obligation of Funds Transparency Act of 2005 - Prohibits a Federal agency from obligating funds made available in an appropriation Act to implement an earmark that is included in a congressional report accompanying such Act, unless the earmark is also included in that Act.

Amends the Rules of the House of Representatives to prohibit waiver of the germaneness requirement for conference reports by a report by the Committee on Rules, unless approved by a vote of three-fifths of the Members voting, with a quorum being present. Limits debate on such a question to 20 minutes equally divided by a proponent and an opponent. States that the above also applies in the case of a special rule that waives all (or specified) points of order. Prohibits the Committee on Rules from reporting a rule or order waiving the above amendment to the rules.