Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/27/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/12/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/18/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/18/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/26/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/15/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/15/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 01/31/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/31/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/31/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/31/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 01/31/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/31/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 01/31/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/01/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/01/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 02/08/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/08/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/08/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 02/08/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/08/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 02/08/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/08/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/08/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/15/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/15/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/15/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 02/15/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/01/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/01/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/01/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/01/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/29/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/08/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew