Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/22/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/08/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/08/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/13/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/13/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/13/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/13/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/13/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/13/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/13/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/13/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 12/13/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/16/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/08/2006