Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/11/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/11/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/12/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/16/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/09/2006