Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/21/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/21/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/28/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/03/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/16/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/19/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/19/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/19/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 05/19/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/19/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/19/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 06/08/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/08/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/15/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/27/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/27/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/27/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/27/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/27/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/20/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/07/2005