Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/14/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/19/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/19/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/19/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/19/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/19/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/19/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/19/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/19/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/19/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/19/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/19/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/19/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/20/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/20/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/21/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/21/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/26/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/26/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/27/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/05/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/05/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/05/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/05/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/05/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/12/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/12/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/12/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/12/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/12/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/12/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/17/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/17/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/17/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/17/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/18/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/18/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/19/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/23/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/23/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/25/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/25/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/25/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/25/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/07/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/07/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 06/07/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/07/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/09/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/13/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/22/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/22/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/23/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/14/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/14/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/14/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/19/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/20/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/20/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/20/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/20/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/21/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/21/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/21/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 07/21/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/21/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/21/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/21/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/22/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/22/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/22/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/25/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 07/25/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/25/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/08/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/08/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/09/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/12/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/15/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/28/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/06/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/14/2006