Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/18/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/24/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/25/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/14/2006