Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/17/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/17/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/17/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/28/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/13/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/13/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/26/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/02/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/07/2005