Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/26/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/26/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/23/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/08/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/16/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/16/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/23/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/23/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/23/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/30/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/30/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/12/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/20/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/28/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/07/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/07/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/06/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/06/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/06/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/25/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/31/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/03/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/07/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/09/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/10/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/10/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/15/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/18/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/18/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/18/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/18/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/07/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/13/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/24/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/06/2006