Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 04/14/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/27/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/27/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/03/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/03/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/03/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/04/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/04/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/04/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/05/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/09/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/09/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/09/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/10/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/10/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/11/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/12/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/16/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/16/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/18/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/18/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/18/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/18/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/23/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/24/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/25/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/25/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/26/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/07/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/16/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/22/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/23/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/29/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/12/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/18/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/06/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/06/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/06/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/06/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/07/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/12/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/13/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/07/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/07/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/18/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/18/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/25/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/26/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/07/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/07/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/16/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/17/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/06/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 12/15/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/31/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/15/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/03/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/24/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/24/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/24/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/06/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/06/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/06/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/06/2006
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/12/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/22/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/26/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/10/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/19/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/24/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/06/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/14/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/25/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/28/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/29/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/14/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 11/14/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/14/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/05/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 12/07/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 12/07/2006