Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/19/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/19/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/26/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/27/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/27/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/28/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/28/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/03/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/10/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/25/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/06/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/06/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/19/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/07/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/19/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/19/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/24/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/06/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/25/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/28/2006