Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/16/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/16/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/16/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/16/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/16/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/25/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/25/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/25/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/25/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/25/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/25/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 05/25/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/25/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/25/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/25/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/25/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/25/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/25/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/26/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/26/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/26/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/08/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/09/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/13/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/20/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/06/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/27/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/27/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/07/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/18/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/21/2006