Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/19/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/26/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/26/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/26/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/28/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/28/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/24/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/24/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/24/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/24/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/24/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/09/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/13/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/17/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 06/23/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/29/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/29/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/29/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/30/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/30/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/30/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/12/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/12/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/18/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/18/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/18/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/26/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/26/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/26/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/27/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/07/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/07/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/07/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/14/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/29/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/29/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/26/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/02/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/02/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/04/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/10/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/10/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/08/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/16/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/01/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/26/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/03/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/11/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/09/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/10/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/29/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/07/2006