Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/20/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/20/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 04/20/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 04/20/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/26/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/10/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/19/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/19/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/26/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/26/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/26/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/08/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/16/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/16/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/16/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/22/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/22/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/22/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/24/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/24/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/28/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/28/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/28/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/30/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 06/30/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/12/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/12/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/12/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/19/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/19/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/19/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/20/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 07/20/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/26/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/26/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/28/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/13/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/20/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/21/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 10/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/17/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/19/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/20/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/27/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 11/03/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/03/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/03/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/16/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/16/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/01/2006