Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/20/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/20/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 04/20/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/05/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/05/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 05/05/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/12/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/17/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/30/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/21/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/21/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/22/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/22/2005