There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 215 Martin Luther King, Jr. Boulevard in Madison, Wisconsin, as the "Robert M. La Follette, Sr. Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
06/17/2005Became Public Law No: 109-15. (TXT | PDF)
06/17/2005Signed by President.
06/09/2005Presented to President.
05/26/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/26/2005Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6064)
05/16/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3271)
04/21/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/17/2005Became Public Law No: 109-15. (TXT | PDF)
06/17/2005Signed by President.
06/09/2005HousePresented to President.
05/26/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/26/2005SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6064)
05/17/2005SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
05/16/2005-2:35pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/16/2005-2:35pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3271)
05/16/2005-2:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1760.
05/16/2005-2:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3271-3273)
05/16/2005-2:21pmHouseMrs. Miller (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/05/2005HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
05/05/2005HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
04/21/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
04/21/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (20)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform04/21/2005 Referred to
05/05/2005 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/17/2005 Referred to
05/26/2005 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.1760.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1760. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-15 (06/17/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 215 Martin Luther King, Jr. Boulevard in Madison, Wisconsin, as the "Robert M. La Follette, Sr. Post Office Building."