There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Child Medication Safety Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Child Medication Safety Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To protect children and their parents from being coerced into administering a controlled substance in order to attend school, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To protect children and their parents from being coerced into administering a controlled substance or a psychotropic drug in order to attend school, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
11/16/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 12, 1 Present (Roll no. 590).(text: CR 11/15/2005 H10185-10186)
04/21/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/17/2005SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
11/16/2005-3:26pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/16/2005-3:26pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 12, 1 Present (Roll no. 590). (text: CR 11/15/2005 H10185-10186)
11/16/2005-3:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/16/2005-3:17pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10342)
11/15/2005-3:43pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/15/2005-3:33pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1790.
11/15/2005-3:33pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10185-10187)
11/15/2005-3:33pmHouseMr. Kline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/09/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Education Reform.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/21/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
04/21/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (25)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce04/21/2005 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Education Reform05/09/2005 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions11/17/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1790. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/16/2005)

Child Medication Safety Act of 2005 - Requires states, as a condition of receiving funds under any program or activity administered by the Secretary of Education, to develop and implement policies and procedures prohibiting school personnel from requiring a child, as a condition of attending school or receiving services, to obtain a prescription for any specified controlled substances listed under the Controlled Substances Act (CSA).

Provides that nothing in such requirement shall be construed to create a federal prohibition against teachers and other school personnel consulting or sharing classroom-based observations with parents or guardians regarding a student's academic performance or behavior in the classroom or school, or regarding the need for evaluation for special education or related services under the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act (IDEA).

Directs the Comptroller General to review and report on: (1) variation among state definitions of psychotropic medication in state jurisdiction over public education; (2) prescription rates of medications used in public schools to treat children diagnosed with attention deficit disorder, attention deficit hyperactivity disorder, and other disorders or illnesses; and (3) which of such medications are CSA-listed and which are not, including properties and effects of the latter and whether they have been considered for CSA-listing.