Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/21/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/07/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/07/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/14/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/20/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/21/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/27/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/20/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/11/2006