Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/21/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/05/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/05/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/05/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/18/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/18/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/16/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/16/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/16/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/28/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/28/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/28/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/28/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/28/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/05/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/05/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/26/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/18/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/26/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/13/2006