Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 04/26/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/26/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/04/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/04/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/04/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/04/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/04/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/04/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/04/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/04/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/04/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/04/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/04/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/04/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/04/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/04/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/18/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/18/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/18/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/18/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/18/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/23/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/23/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/14/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/14/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/14/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/14/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/14/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/12/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/21/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/29/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/07/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/09/2006