Committees: H.R.1815 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services04/26/2005 Referred to
05/18/2005 Markup by
05/20/2005 Reported by H. Rept. 109-89
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Terrorism, Unconventional Threats and Capabilities04/30/2005 Referred to
05/11/2005 Markup by
05/11/2005 Reported by
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Projection Forces04/30/2005 Referred to
05/11/2005 Markup by
05/11/2005 Reported by
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel04/30/2005 Referred to
05/11/2005 Markup by
05/11/2005 Reported by
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness04/30/2005 Referred to
05/12/2005 Markup by
05/12/2005 Reported by
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Strategic Forces04/30/2005 Referred to
05/12/2005 Markup by
05/12/2005 Reported by
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Tactical Air and Land Forces04/30/2005 Referred to
05/12/2005 Markup by
05/12/2005 Reported by
Senate Armed Services06/06/2005 Referred to
11/15/2005 Discharged from