There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Truth in Employment Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Labor Relations Act to protect employer rights.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/26/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
06/22/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/26/2005Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/26/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/10/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/10/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/17/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/17/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/24/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/08/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/08/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/21/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/21/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/21/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 06/21/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/12/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/12/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/28/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/14/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/18/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/07/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/13/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce04/26/2005 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations06/22/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1816. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/26/2005)

Truth in Employment Act of 2005 - Amends the National Labor Relations Act to provide that nothing in specified prohibitions against unfair labor practices by employers shall be construed as requiring an employer to employ any person who seeks or has sought employment with the employer in furtherance of other employment or agency status.