Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/10/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/10/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/10/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/17/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/17/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/24/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/08/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/08/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/21/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/21/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/21/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 06/21/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/12/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/12/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/28/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/14/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/18/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/07/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 06/13/2006