Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/26/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/26/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 04/26/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/26/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/26/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/26/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/26/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 04/26/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/26/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/10/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/10/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/24/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/24/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/24/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/24/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/26/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/13/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/13/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/13/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/27/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/14/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/14/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/20/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/13/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/13/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/13/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/20/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 10/17/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/25/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/26/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/27/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/01/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/01/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/01/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/01/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/02/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/08/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/08/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/16/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/07/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/14/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/30/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/05/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/26/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/26/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/08/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/16/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/16/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/20/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/11/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/27/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 11/14/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/14/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/14/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/05/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/05/2006