Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/05/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/05/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/17/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/24/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/26/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/09/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/15/2005