Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/26/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/11/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/17/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/24/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/24/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/24/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/24/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/24/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/24/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/24/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/24/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/24/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/24/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/24/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/24/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/24/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/28/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/28/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/28/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/28/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/28/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/28/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/28/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/28/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/28/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/28/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/28/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/28/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/28/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/28/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/28/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/27/2006