Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/28/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/25/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/28/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 11/03/2005