Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/27/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/28/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/03/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/17/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/09/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/13/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/11/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/11/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/28/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/02/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/27/2006