Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/25/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/12/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/26/2006