Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/05/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/11/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 05/12/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 05/24/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/22/2005