Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/04/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/06/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/01/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/01/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/12/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/18/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/21/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/26/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/08/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/16/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/27/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/27/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/18/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 11/02/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/06/2005
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/16/2005
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/22/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/07/2006