Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/27/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/27/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/27/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/27/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/27/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/12/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/12/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/12/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/12/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/12/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/23/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/20/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/20/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/20/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/20/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/27/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/27/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/21/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/21/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/30/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/22/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/28/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/21/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/21/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/27/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/27/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/27/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/27/2006