Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/19/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/19/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/02/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/16/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/13/2006