Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 04/28/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 04/28/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/19/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/08/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/13/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/13/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/13/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/15/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/15/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/15/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/16/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/16/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/16/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/27/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/27/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/28/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/28/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/11/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/11/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 07/18/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/18/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/18/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/18/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/25/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 07/29/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/29/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/07/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/13/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/14/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/20/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/22/2005
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/22/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/07/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/19/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/19/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/19/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/19/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/25/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/26/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/27/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/27/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/01/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/01/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/02/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/09/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/09/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/10/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 11/10/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/15/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/15/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/17/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 11/17/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/17/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/07/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/07/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 12/07/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/07/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/07/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/08/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 12/16/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/14/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/28/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/28/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/02/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/07/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/14/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/14/2006
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 03/14/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/16/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/28/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/29/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/30/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/30/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/30/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/30/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/30/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/30/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/04/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/04/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/04/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 04/05/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/05/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/05/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/06/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/06/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/06/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/06/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/06/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/25/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/04/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/16/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/19/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/24/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/22/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/28/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/12/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/12/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/13/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/13/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/13/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/17/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/17/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/17/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/17/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/17/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/17/2006
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/19/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 07/19/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/19/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/19/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/24/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/06/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/06/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/12/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/19/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/19/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/21/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/25/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/25/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 09/27/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/27/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/27/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/29/2006