Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/03/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/11/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/11/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/11/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/11/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/11/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/11/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/11/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/12/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/16/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/16/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/16/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/16/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/18/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/19/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/25/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/25/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/07/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/07/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/07/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/07/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/07/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/09/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/13/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/13/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/13/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/14/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/15/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/21/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/21/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/23/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/29/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/21/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/06/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/06/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/06/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/07/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/14/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/14/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/20/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/20/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/21/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/28/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/28/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/29/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/17/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/17/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/19/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/20/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/26/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/26/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/26/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/26/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/26/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/27/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/27/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/27/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/27/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/27/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/27/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/27/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/27/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/27/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 10/27/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/27/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/27/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/27/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/27/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/27/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/27/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/27/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/27/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/27/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/27/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/27/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/27/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/27/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/27/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/27/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/27/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/27/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/27/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/27/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/27/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/27/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/27/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/27/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 10/28/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/28/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/28/2005