There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Welcome Home G.I. Bill Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend titles 10 and 38, United States Code, to increase benefits for members of the Armed Forces who, after September 11, 2001, serve on active duty outside the United States or its territories or possessions as part of a contingency operation (including a humanitarian operation, peacekeeping operation, or similar operation) or a combat operation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/28/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
06/21/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
06/01/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
06/01/2005Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2005Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/28/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2005Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1028)
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services04/28/2005 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel06/21/2005 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs04/28/2005 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity06/01/2005 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health06/01/2005 Referred to
House Ways and Means04/28/2005 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1982. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/28/2005)

Welcome Home G.I. Bill Act of 2005 - Increases and extends the duration of basic educational assistance for individuals who serve at least six consecutive months (with exceptions from the six consecutive months requirement due to medical, hardship, or involuntary separation ) on active duty outside the United States as part of a combat or contingency operation (including a humanitarian or peacekeeping operation) beginning on September 11, 2001, and ending five years after enactment of this Act.

Permits assistance use for student loan repayment. Provides for refund of educational contributions made under the Montgomery G.I. Bill program.

Increases and extends the duration of educational assistance for reserve component members called or ordered to active service in response to a war or national emergency who perform active duty service for 180 consecutive days before the five-year period beginning on the date of enactment of this Act. Permits assistance use for student loan repayment.

Provides $5,000 for a residential purchase downpayment for a veteran who: (1) performs active duty service outside the United States as part of a combat or contingency operation (including a humanitarian or peacekeeping operation) for at least six consecutive months (or a lesser time period for an individual with a service-connected disability) after September 11, 2001; and (2) has not previously obtained a veterans' guaranteed or insured housing loan. Makes such benefit available for five years from the date eligible service is completed.

Amends the the Internal Revenue Code to exclude such housing benefit from gross income.

Provides transitional health care benefits during the five-year period after separation from active duty for an individual who is not covered under an employer-provided or a spouse's employer-provided group health plan who: (1) serves in the active military, naval, or air service; (2) after September 11, 2001, is deployed outside the United States as part of a combat or contingency operation (including a humanitarian or peacekeeping operation) for at least six consecutive months (or a lesser time period for an individual with a service-connected disability); and (3) is discharged or released under conditions other than dishonorable.

Revises predeployment and postdeployment medical exam provisions.