Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/28/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/11/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/11/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/11/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/25/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/30/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/30/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/20/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/20/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/26/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/26/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/26/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/26/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/26/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/02/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/15/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/26/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/11/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/11/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/19/2006